THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:46:26 AM
Swallow, Carol Jane
CPSO#:
54151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 May 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 1225
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-1558
Fax: (416) 586-8392
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROL JANE SWALLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWALLOW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 1993 |