THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:59:23 PM
Keely, Erin Joanne
CPSO#:
54104
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: 613 738 8400 Ext. 81946
Fax: 613 738 8261
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:07 Sep 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIN JOANNE KEELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEELY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1986 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Sep 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |