THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:59:09 AM
Laudanski, Gerald John
CPSO#:
54099
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
315-68 Songhees Rd
Victoria BC V9A0A3
Phone: 416 418 3560
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Laudanski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2018 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 8, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gerald John Laudanski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective Aiugust 8, 2020:
Dr. Laudanski underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice following a College investigation. The reassessment report received by the College continued to raise some concerns about his medical record keeping. As a result, Dr. Laudanski will resign from the College on August 31, 2020 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gerald John Laudanski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 9, 2018:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Laudanski engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in. As a result of the investigation:
-Dr. Laudanski will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months.
-Dr. Laudanski will engage in professional education in:
(i) University of Toronto program in Safe Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and the workshop);
(ii) University of Toronto Medial Record-Keeping Course; and
(iii) Review and written summary of the Diabetes Canada Clinical Practice Guidelines, which can be found at http://guidelines.diabetes.ca/app_themes/cdacpg/resources/cpg_2013_full_en.pdf
-Dr. Laudanski’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.