THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:06:30 PM
Schemitsch, Emil Harald
CPSO#:
54083
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C9-116
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3307
Fax: (519) 663-3043
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMIL HARALD SCHEMITSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEMITSCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1986 |