THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:26:56 AM
McPherson, Phyllis Ruth
CPSO#:
54082
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
McPherson-Kay, Phyllis Ruth (used until: 02 Jul 1984 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H4203
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7341
Fax: (613) 696-7130
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:09 Sep 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHYLLIS RUTH MCPHERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCPHERSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1985 |