THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 22:26:38 PM
Ostrowski, Marian Antoni
CPSO#:
54074
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 4CC 180
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5568
Fax: (416) 864-5310
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:14 Dec 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:01 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIAN ANTONI OSTROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1987 |