THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:01:13 PM
Oryema, John Uma
CPSO#:
54069
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Acholi, English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5-2555 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1K 5J1
Phone: 416-750-1222
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN UMA ORYEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORYEMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1985 |