THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:55:51 PM
Velamoor, Varadaraj Rajagopal
CPSO#:
54053
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Varadaraj, Rajagopal (used until: 09 Jun 1989 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Tamil, Telugu
Education: Osmania University, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Member, Consent and Capacity Board
BOX 52
Toronto ON M7A 1N3
Phone: 416-201-8058
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Velamoor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 30 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
|
Active |