THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:01:22 AM
Casola, Paul Gerard
CPSO#:
54052
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
355 Eglinton Avenue East
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M4P 1M5
Phone: (416) 277-8361
Fax: (647) 800-6758
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL GERARD CASOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASOLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1985 |