THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:33:52 PM
Willett, Janice Ann
CPSO#:
53996
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1882 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2H1
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Willett Woolner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit: 28 Eugene Street, North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy/transfer of their medical record can contact DocuDavit Solutions at: Telephone 1-888-781-9083, Fax 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 15 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:27 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2021 |