THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:09:19 AM
Freeman, Jeffrey Maximilian
CPSO#:
53985
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
369 Mary St.
Wiarton ON N0H 2T0
Phone: 5195342411
Fax: 5195342413
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jeff Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Jeff Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 24 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY MAXIMILIAN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |