THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:03:26 AM
Jeney, Elizabeth Victoria Maria
CPSO#:
53975
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1550 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON L9B 2L6
Phone: (905) 575-4429
Fax: (905) 575-4456
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:08 Sep 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH VICTORIA MARIA JENEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1988 |