THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:28:18 AM
Kim, Meehai Marie
CPSO#:
53952
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Apr 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Ron Joyce Children's Centre
DPR Level III
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 47575
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEEHAI MARIE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 1989 |