THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:43:58 PM
Shubat, John Michael
CPSO#:
53940
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Michael Shubat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:E-Records 2009 to Present: Wingham Family Health Team
Paper Records 1985 to 2009: Lucknow Medical Centre
Lucknow Medical Centre
691 Havelock St
Box 160
Lucknow, ON N0G 2HG0
Tel: 519-528-2810
Date Received: 31 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |