THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:40:03 AM
Glowacki, Adam Ryszard
CPSO#:
53931
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Glowacki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For medical records please contact: 519-980-4685
Date Received: 14 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:18 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |