THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:43:46 AM
Cooper, Steven Martin
CPSO#:
53917
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1072 Doran Road
Pembroke ON K8A 6W7
Phone: (613) 687-8107
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:22 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN MARTIN COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1985 |