THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 9:44:42 AM
Seagrist, William Scott
CPSO#:
53913
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2022 |
|
Active |