THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:16:55 PM
Nitsch, Barbara Ann
CPSO#:
53900
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Nitsch-Kasman, Barbara Ann (used until: 07 Sep 1999 )
Nitsch, Barbara Ann (used until: 06 Aug 1985 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 700
1235 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5R 3K4
Phone: (416) 388-1455
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Nitsch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - Colorado
USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARBARA ANN NITSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITSCH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1985 |