THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:52:24 PM
Belo, Susan Eva
CPSO#:
53889
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
26 Feb 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. Belo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 28 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1987 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Aug 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Feb 2021 |