THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:59:41 PM
Ashe, Kassem Ali
CPSO#:
53888
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's Regional Cardiac Care Ctr
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749 6946
Fax: (519) 749-6677
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kassem Ashe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Dr Kassem Ashe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KASSEM ALI ASHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1987 |