THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:39:00 AM
Eaton, Jo-Ann Margaret
CPSO#:
53878
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jo-Ann M. Eaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 11 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DOCUdavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
North York ON M6B 3Z4
1.888.781.9083
Date Received: 18 Mar 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2023 |