THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:13:26 PM
Hajjar, George Elias
CPSO#:
53875
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 May 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
A280
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE ELIAS HAJJAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJJAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 1990 |