THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:45:24 PM
Wells, Philip Stephen
CPSO#:
53868
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137985555 Ext. 71020
Fax: 6137378093
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall General Hospital |
Cornwall |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP STEPHEN WELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELLS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Clinical Haematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |