THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:52:51 PM
Jones, Glenn Wayne
CPSO#:
53865
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Glenn Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Credit Valley Hospital Oncology Centre, 2200 Eglinton Avenue West, Mississauga, ON, L5M 2N1
Date Received: 05 Aug 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Antigua and Barbuda
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:16 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Dec 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2016 |