THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:43:13 PM
Birchard, James David
CPSO#:
53864
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
274 Dundas Street East
Suite 201
Belleville ON K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 969-8087
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES DAVID BIRCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRCHARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1985 |