THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 21:02:17 PM
Raphael, Simon Jonathan
CPSO#:
53863
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Nov 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4SE Room 106
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6517
Fax: (416) 756-4294
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:31 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIMON JONATHAN RAPHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHAEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1985 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 1985 |