THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:34:31 AM
Poirier-Groulx, Marie Cecile Lise
CPSO#:
53851
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Poirier, Marie Cecile Lise (used until: 15 May 1990 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2170 Valin St
Orléans ON K4A 4T2
Phone: 6138307774
Fax: 6138303414
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lise Poirier-Groulx Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE CECILE LISE POIRIER-GROULX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POIRIER-GROULX is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1986 |