THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:52:18 PM
Bullock, Richard Wayne
CPSO#:
53849
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
340 York Blvd
Hamilton ON L8R 3L2
Phone: (905) 525-1677
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 17, 2017, Hamilton Health Sciences notified the College that effective June 2017, Dr. Richard Bullock has agreed not to exercise his emergency room privileges at Hamilton Health Sciences during the course of an investigation by Hamilton Health Sciences into Dr. Bullock’s professional activities.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Oct 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD WAYNE BULLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1985 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 5, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Richard Wayne Bullock was found guilty of the following offence:
Failure or refusal to comply with a demand by a peace officer for a breathalyzer test, contrary to Section 254(5) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: April 16, 2018
SENTENCE: I year driving prohibition; Fine of $1,000.