THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:30:02 PM
Dobkowski, Wojciech Boguslaw
CPSO#:
53833
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
08 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Wojciech B Dobkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2018 |