THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:02:10 AM
Fernando, Manthrihewage Lakshman Dayasundara
CPSO#:
53811
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Aug 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese
Education: University of Ceylon, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. M.L.D. Fernando Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical record location as per above.
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock, ON N4V 0A4
or
PO Box 21021
London, ON N6K 0C7
Date Received: 08 Mar 2018
Instructions/Address:Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Date Received: 26 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2017 |