THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:59:34 PM
Thatte, Smita Vinay
CPSO#:
53792
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Marathi
Education: Nagpur University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6221
Fax: 613 761 3603
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:22 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SMITA VINAY THATTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THATTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 1989 to 31 Jan 1990
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1989 |