THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:40:01 PM
Fung, Ambrose Yi Tat
CPSO#:
53752
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Mar 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Corporation Name: Ambrose Y.T. Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 9 2010
Corporation Name: Ambrose Yi Tat Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto, Ontario.
M4K 2P8
Date Received: 30 Jun 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2021 |