THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 14:24:12 PM
Rocci, Adriano
CPSO#:
53710
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Nov 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Milton Lifecare Clinic 100 Bronte S
Milton ON L9T 1Y8
Phone: (905) 878-6868
Fax: (905) 878-2992
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADRIANO ROCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCCI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Mar 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 1984 |