THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:15:32 PM
Divaris, Dimitrios Xenophon Georgeou
CPSO#:
53675
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Zimbabwe, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department Of Laboratories
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2323
Fax: (519) 744-4221
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dimitrios Divaris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 21 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:14 Dec 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIMITRIOS XENOPHON GEORGEOU DIVARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIVARIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1987 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Dec 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 1989 |