THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:40:42 AM
Chan, Clifford Chi Choy
CPSO#:
53622
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
15 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Nov 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Manitoba, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Clifford Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 21 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd: 13 - 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 15 Jan 2020
Instructions/Address:
Patients may send medical record requests to Records Management Ltd:
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 26 Sep 2019
Instructions/Address:Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
or
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:21 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2020 |