THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 10:05:37 AM
Genik, Jeffrey Lee
CPSO#:
53599
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Oct 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Alpha Global IT GlobeMed environment hosted in Microsoft Azure Canada Central Toronto with Disaster Recovery Site in Canada East(Quebec City)
Azure Managed Services for Alpha Global IT provided by Aptum Technologies.
Contact Information:
Leslie Esau
Lead, Technical Support Services
Alpha Global iT
1262 Don Mills Road, Toronto ON M3B 2W7
Tel. 416 449 2166 Ext. 1253
Fax. 416 449 2543
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 30 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |