THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:28:11 PM
Rosebush, Patricia Irene
CPSO#:
53584
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Psychiatry
St Joseph's Hospital
Fontbonne Building Suite F401
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON L8P 3B6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33674
Fax: (905) 308-7202
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICIA IRENE ROSEBUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEBUSH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Aug 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 1986 |