THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 11:13:25 AM
Gordon, Elaine Paula
CPSO#:
53460
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 May 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
22-May-2020
Former Name:
Gordon, Ellaine Paula (used until: 13 May 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Elaine Gordon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hamilton Health Sciences Mideical Records
237 Barten St E
Hamilton, ON L8L 2X2
Date Received: 22 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:03 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jun 2018 |