THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:03:16 AM
Bazile, Emilio
CPSO#:
53445
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Nov 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Nov 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Creole, English, French
Education: University of Haiti, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
311 McArthur Avenue
Suite 108
Ottawa ON K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 746-4845
Fax: (613) 746-7017
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Haiti
Quebec
USA - Minnesota
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Cornwall General Hospital |
Cornwall |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILIO BAZILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZILE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 1987 |