THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:20:13 AM
Freeman, Jeffrey Michael
CPSO#:
53428
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Mar 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jeffrey M. Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 28 Feb 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jul 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Mar 2020 |