THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:05:07 PM
Saleem, Azra Khurram
CPSO#:
53414
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1992 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |