THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:35:22 AM
Fernandes, John Roque
CPSO#:
53412
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
18 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
18-Apr-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John R. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:14 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Pathology |
Effective:29 May 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 18 Apr 2019 |