THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:37:23 AM
Mohan, Naresh
CPSO#:
53394
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Mar 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
104-305 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON M1B 3V4
Phone: 416-724-7774
Fax: 416-724-7752
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NARESH MOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Jul 1988
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 1989 |