THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:33:49 PM
Prefontaine, Michel E.
CPSO#:
53388
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Feb 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
268 Grosvenor St
London ON N6A 5W9
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:06 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHEL E. PREFONTAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREFONTAINE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2007 |