THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:50:57 PM
Therrien, Joseph Alain Georges Jean
CPSO#:
53382
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jul 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jean Therrien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may email: [email protected]
Date Received: 13 Aug 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Other Canadian Colleges
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: July 17, 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
On March 21, 2017, the Disciplinary Board of the Collège des médecins du Québec (CMQ) found Dr. Therrien guilty in respect of a complaint that he exceeded his field of competence, failed to consult to refer to a colleague or specialist, omitted an act or did an untimely act contrary to current scientific medical information, and did surgery without the necessary assistance, contrary to articles 42, 47 and 53 of the Code of Ethics of Physicians (Quebec), and article 59.2 of the Quebec Professional Code. The case involved treatment of a laceration of a young child’s eyelid. As the sanction for this finding, Dr. Therrien was struck from the CMQ’s register (i.e. suspended from practising medicine in Quebec) for a period of 6 weeks from April 24, 2017 to June 2, 2017. The College was notified of this finding by correspondence received on September 12, 2017.