THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:09:21 PM
Wong, Peter Douglas
CPSO#:
53355
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
722 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 743-6063
Fax: (416) 743-0101
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:06 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER DOUGLAS WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1987 |