THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:37:55 AM
Adesanya, Augustine Tunde
CPSO#:
53341
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Office Building
Timmins and District Hospital
Suite C
640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON P4N 0A2
Phone: (705) 268-9788
Fax: (705) 268-2077
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A.T. Adesanya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. A.T. Adesanya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical record requests should be submitted to Dr. Augustine Adesanya via email at [email protected] or [email protected] or via text message at 705-360-3678.
Date Received: 05 Feb 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Anson General Hospital |
Iroquois Falls |
Bingham Memorial Hospital |
Matheson |
Lady Minto Hospital |
Cochrane |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AUGUSTINE TUNDE ADESANYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADESANYA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1985 |