THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:37:04 PM
Cha, Lily Shao-Li
CPSO#:
53316
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Apr 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Manitoba, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1275 Finch Ave W
unit 103
North York ON M3J 0L5
Phone: 4166337201
Fax: 4166338576
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Lily Cha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:17 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LILY SHAO-LI CHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 1988 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On December 11, 2020, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Cha in respect of an incident that took place in September 2014.