THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:14:50 AM
Van Der Jagt, Richard Henry Constantine
CPSO#:
53302
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Office of Clinical Trials
Health Canada
1600 Scott Street
K1A OK9
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Van Der Jagt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical Records Department
501 Smyth Road,
Ottawa Hospital,
Ottawa K1H 8L6
Date Received: 27 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD HENRY CONSTANTINE VAN DER JAGT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER JAGT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Internship - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Mar 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2022 |