THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/09/24 20:54:06 PM
Heslop, Winston Lloyd
CPSO#:
53261
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
31 Centre St South
Brampton ON L6W 2X7
Phone: (905) 455-3010
Fax: (905) 4553011
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WINSTON LLOYD HESLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESLOP is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1983 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2005 |